No. 15-162 | ||||
Title: |
| |||
Docketed: | August 5, 2015 | |||
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-20292) |
Decision Date: | May 4, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 3 2015 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 4, 2015) |
Aug 21 2015 | Waiver of right of respondents Joel Fitzgerald, Individually and in His Official Capacity as Chief of Police of the City of Missouri City, Texas, et al. to respond filed. |
Sep 2 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015. |
Sep 18 2015 | Response Requested . (Due October 19, 2015) |
Oct 19 2015 | Brief of respondents Joel Fitzgerald, Individually and in His Official Capacity as Chief of Police of the City of Missouri City, Texas, et al. in opposition filed. |
Nov 2 2015 | Reply of petitioner Peter J. Paske, Jr. filed. |
Nov 4 2015 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 24, 2015. |
Nov 30 2015 | Petition DENIED. |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ | ~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | ||
Eric Schnapper | University of Washington School of Law | (206) 616-3167 |
Counsel of Record | P.O. Box 353020 | |
Seattle, WA 98195 | ||
schnapp@u.washington.edu | ||
Party name: Peter J. Paske, Jr. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents: | ||
William S. Helfand | Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry | (713) 654-9630 |
Counsel of Record | 1200 Smith Street, Suite 1400 | |
Houston, TX 77002 | ||
bill.helfand@chamberlainlaw.com | ||
Party name: Joel Fitzgerald, Individually and in His Official Capacity as Chief of Police of the City of Missouri City, Texas, et al. |